ME LD1775 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 252 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 252 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Sustenance Fishing
Title
An Act To Protect Sustenance Fishing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Enactment RC #252 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - Enactment RC #208 (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - Enactment RC #208 (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 252 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 208 (Yeas 132 - Nays 4 - Absent 12 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-490), in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-490) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-490). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-23 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2019-05-23 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |