ME LD1769 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Concerning Students Who Experience Educational Disruption Due to Temporary or Permanent Changes Where They Live

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Students Who Experience Educational Disruption Due to Temporary or Permanent Changes Where They Live

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-10SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
2023-07-26SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
2023-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-08HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-332) in concurrence
2023-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-332) READ and ADOPTED
2023-06-07SenateREAD ONCE
2023-06-07SenateOn motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2023-06-07SenateReports Read
2023-06-06HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-06HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-332).
2023-06-06HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2023-06-06HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-332) was READ and ADOPTED.
2023-06-06HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2023-06-06HouseOn motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-06-06HouseReports READ.
2023-06-05JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2023-05-16JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-05-16JointWork Session Held
2023-04-25SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2023-04-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-04-25HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2023-04-25HouseCommittee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback