ME LD1767 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Tribal Representation in the Public Health Infrastructure
Title
An Act To Ensure Tribal Representation in the Public Health Infrastructure
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Newell [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-01-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-01-26 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-01-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2022-01-12 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2022-01-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-11-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-11-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on November 30, 2021. |