ME LD1765 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide a Source of Revenue To Preserve the Integrity of Maine's Transportation Infrastructure
Title
An Act To Provide a Source of Revenue To Preserve the Integrity of Maine's Transportation Infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-22 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-22 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2018-01-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2018-01-03 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1765&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1219&item=1&snum=128 |