ME LD176 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Authorize the Maine Public Employees Retirement System To Procure and Offer Long-term Disability Insurance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Authorize the Maine Public Employees Retirement System To Procure and Offer Long-term Disability Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-02HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-03-28SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2018-03-28SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-681), in concurrence.
2018-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-681) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2018-03-28SenateREAD ONCE.
2018-03-28SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2018-03-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-27HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-681).
2018-03-27HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-03-27HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-01-26SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2017-01-26HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-26HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
2017-01-26HouseCommittee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback