ME LD1759 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Rename the Coast of Maine Wildlife Management Area as the Alan E. Hutchinson Wildlife Management Area

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Rename the Coast of Maine Wildlife Management Area as the Alan E. Hutchinson Wildlife Management Area

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-02-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-02-13HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-02-08SenateOrdered sent down forthwith
2018-02-08SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
2018-02-08SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2018-02-06SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2018-02-06SenateREAD ONCE
2018-02-06SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2018-02-01HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-02-01HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2018-02-01HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-02-01HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2018-01-09SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence
2018-01-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-01-03HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
2018-01-03HouseCommittee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback