ME LD1759 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, To Transfer the Ownership of the Fort Kent Armory from the Military Bureau to the University of Maine at Fort Kent
Title
Resolve, To Transfer the Ownership of the Fort Kent Armory from the Military Bureau to the University of Maine at Fort Kent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2010-04-12 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland taken from the Special Appropriations Table | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator BARTLETT of Cumberland The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-831) in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) On motion of Representative TRINWARD of Waterville, The House INSISTED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-831). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-761) and House Amendment "A" (H-831) In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) House Amendment "A" (H-831) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-761) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator SULLIVAN of York Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-761) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence (Remarks Made) | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-831). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) On motion of Representative TRINWARD of Waterville, House Amendment "A" (H-831) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (H-761) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-761) was READ. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The Resolve was READ ONCE. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Representative TRINWARD of Waterville moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) On motion by Senator Sullivan of York, REFERRED to the Committee on LEGAL AND VETERANS AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on LEGAL AND VETERANS AFFAIRS. | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Committee on Legal and Veterans Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |