ME LD1752 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Insurance Coverage for a Beneficiary on a Transfer on Death Deed
Title
An Act To Provide Insurance Coverage for a Beneficiary on a Transfer on Death Deed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-02-23 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-02-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-417). |
2022-02-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-02-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-417). |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-417) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on November 30, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |