ME LD1746 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Licensing Laws of Certain Professions and Occupations
Title
An Act To Amend the Licensing Laws of Certain Professions and Occupations
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Herbig [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - Adopt Hah-626 RC #288 (Y: 78 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #287 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #287 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-18 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-316). |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-316) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-316) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo The Senate RECEDED From PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) |
2019-06-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-18 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-06-18 | House | The House RECEDED. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate ADHERED To Acceptance of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) Report and the Bill PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) |
2019-06-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-18 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-06-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) and House Amendment "A" (H-626). |
2019-06-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 288 (Yeas 78 - Nays 59 - Absent 13 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, House Amendment "A" (H-626) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-18 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 287 (Yeas 137 - Nays 0 - Absent 13 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-18 | House | On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-05-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |