ME LD1746 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Facilitate Informed Planning for Higher Education and Careers
Title
An Act To Facilitate Informed Planning for Higher Education and Careers
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] |
Sen. Linda Valentino [D] | Rep. Peter Johnson [R] | Rep. Peter Kent [D] | Rep. Victoria Kornfield [D] |
Sen. Joyce Maker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #729 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 729 (Yeas 143 - Nays 0 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-743) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-537) thereto |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-743) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-537) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-743) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-537) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-537) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-743) READ and ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator The Senate Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-743). |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, the Senate, Under suspension of the rules, RECONSIDERED whereby Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-743), in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator FLOOD of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-743), in concurrence. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-743) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-743) |
2014-03-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-03-26 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-03-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-01-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Maine's Workforce and Economic Future, in concurrence. |
2014-01-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on MAINE'S WORKFORCE AND ECONOMIC FUTURE. |
2014-01-23 | House | Joint Select Committee on Maine's Workforce and Economic Future suggested and ordered printed. |