ME LD1742 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Compliance with the Interstate Fishery Management Plan for American Lobster
Title
An Act To Ensure Compliance with the Interstate Fishery Management Plan for American Lobster
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-02-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-422). |
2022-02-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-02-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-422). |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-422) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-18 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on November 30, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |