ME LD1734 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 41: Special Restrictions on Pesticide Use, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Agriculture, Food and Rural Resources, Board of Pesticides Control
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 41: Special Restrictions on Pesticide Use, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Agriculture, Food and Rural Resources, Board of Pesticides Control
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | (S) FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2012-02-22 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-22 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) READ ONCE. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2012-02-15 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2012-01-04 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence On motion by Senator Sherman of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218 in concurrence | |
2012-01-04 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2012-01-04 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. | |
2012-01-04 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2012-01-04 | (H) Representative EDGECOMB for the Department of Agriculture, Food and Rural Resources, Board of Pesticides Control pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |