ME LD1726 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Penalize Violators of Wood Shipment and Quarantine Laws
Title
An Act To Penalize Violators of Wood Shipment and Quarantine Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-412). |
2020-03-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-03-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-412). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-412) READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-05-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |