ME LD1725 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a Minimum Age To Hold a Limited-purpose Aquaculture License
Title
An Act To Create a Minimum Age To Hold a Limited-purpose Aquaculture License
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-03 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-05-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-163). |
2019-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-163). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-163) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee on MARINE RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |