ME LD1724 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish the Commission on Autonomous Vehicles and To Allow the Testing, Demonstration and Deployment of Automated Driving Systems
Title
Resolve, To Establish the Commission on Autonomous Vehicles and To Allow the Testing, Demonstration and Deployment of Automated Driving Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-649), in concurrence. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-649) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-649). |
2018-03-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-12-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-12-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017. |