ME LD1722 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Access to All Paths to Recovery for Persons Affected by Opioids Using Money Obtained through Litigation against Opioid Manufacturers
Title
An Act To Ensure Access to All Paths to Recovery for Persons Affected by Opioids Using Money Obtained through Litigation against Opioid Manufacturers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-13 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-997), in concurrence. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-997) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-997). |
2022-04-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-13 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-12 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2021-05-19 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |