ME LD172 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Maine Board of Pharmacy To Evaluate Existing Accommodations Available to Persons Who Are Visually Impaired To Access Prescription Information
Title
Resolve, Directing the Maine Board of Pharmacy To Evaluate Existing Accommodations Available to Persons Who Are Visually Impaired To Access Prescription Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-13), in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-13) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-13). |
2021-03-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-03-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-03-04 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-03-04 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-02-23 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-01-21 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-21 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 21, 2021. |