ME LD1719 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 12 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Geographic Information System Data Acquisition and Maintenance
Title
An Act To Improve Geographic Information System Data Acquisition and Maintenance
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Black [R] | Rep. Susan Austin [R] | Sen. Everett Carson [D] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] |
Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Rep. Dennis Keschl [R] | Sen. David Miramant [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-02-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-261). |
2019-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-261). |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-261) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |