ME LD1718 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Exempt Purchases by Pet Food Pantries from Sales Tax
Title
An Act To Exempt Purchases by Pet Food Pantries from Sales Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-241). |
2019-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-241). |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-241) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |