ME LD1717 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify and Correct Maine's Fish and Wildlife Laws
Title
An Act To Clarify and Correct Maine's Fish and Wildlife Laws
Sponsors
Rep. John Martin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-492), in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-492) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-492). |
2019-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |