ME LD1711 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Save Lives by Establishing a Homeless Opioid Users Service Engagement Pilot Project within the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Resolve, To Save Lives by Establishing a Homeless Opioid Users Service Engagement Pilot Project within the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #722 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Final Passage RC #699 (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - Adopt Cah-737 RC #588 (Y: 94 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Final Passage RC #699 (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - Adopt Cah-737 RC #588 (Y: 94 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-07-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 722V 87 having voted in the affirmative and 56 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Resolve not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2018-07-09 | House | This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 699 Yeas 16 - Nays 15 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-737) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-523) thereto. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-737) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-523) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-737) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-523) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-523) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-737) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-737) was ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-737) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2018-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-737) in concurrence |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-737) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-10 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-737). |
2018-04-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 588 (Yeas 94 - Nays 52 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-737) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-10 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-10 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-12-22 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-12-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017. |