ME LD1710 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Establish the Commission to Improve Tenant-Landlord Relationships and Maximize the Use of Housing Vouchers
Title
Resolve, to Establish the Commission to Improve Tenant-Landlord Relationships and Maximize the Use of Housing Vouchers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2024-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-19 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-821) in concurrence |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-821) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator PIERCE of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-03-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-821). |
2024-03-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-821) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-03-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | On motion of Representative GERE of Kennebunkport, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-12 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-02-13 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-02-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-05 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-04-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator Pierce of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on Housing, in concurrence. |
2023-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-18 | House | On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, the Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on HOUSING. |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed. |