ME LD1710 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Retain Call Centers in Maine
Title
An Act To Retain Call Centers in Maine
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Sen. Erin Herbig [D] | Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] |
Sen. John Patrick [D] | Rep. Mark Eves [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Mccabe [D] | Rep. Joshua Plante [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - Recede And Concur RC #661 (Y: 79 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #551 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Recede RC #550 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #570 (Y: 78 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #478 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #551 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Recede RC #550 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #570 (Y: 78 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #478 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-08 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 661 (Yeas 79 - Nays 67 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-08 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-420) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-501). |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-420) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-501) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Senate Amendment "A" (S-501) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-420) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 551 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-420) Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 550 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate RECEDED From ACCEPTANCE of the Majority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2014-03-26 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-26 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2014-03-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-420). |
2014-03-26 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-420) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-26 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 570 (Yeas 78 - Nays 63 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-26 | House | Subsequently, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-26 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-25 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-25 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2014-03-25 | House | Representative HERBIG of Belfast moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2014-03-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 478 13 Yeas - 22 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent FAILED |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Subsequently, motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED |
2014-03-24 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-18 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-12 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senator PATRICK of Oxford moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2014-01-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-09 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2014-01-08 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |