ME LD171 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Add the Air Medal as an Option for a Special Commemorative Decal on Special Veterans Registration Plates
Title
An Act To Add the Air Medal as an Option for a Special Commemorative Decal on Special Veterans Registration Plates
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Michael Devin [D] |
Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] | Rep. Thomas Longstaff [D] | Rep. Andrew McLean [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2017-03-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-03-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2017-03-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2017-01-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |