ME LD1708 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide for the Merger of Hospital Administrative District No. 4 into MRH Corp., a Maine Nonprofit, Nonstock Private Corporation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide for the Merger of Hospital Administrative District No. 4 into MRH Corp., a Maine Nonprofit, Nonstock Private Corporation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
2019-06-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-20HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-06-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-537) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-367) thereto.
2019-06-19SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-537) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-367) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-19SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-537) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-367) thereto ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-367) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-537) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-537) was ADOPTED
2019-06-19SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-537)
2019-06-19SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2019-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2019-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-12HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-06-11SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-06-11SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-537), in concurrence.
2019-06-11SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-537) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-11SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-11SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-11HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-537).
2019-06-11HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-11HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-05-09SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence
2019-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-09HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
2019-05-09HouseCommittee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback