ME LD1708 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 27 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Allow Relatives and Legal Guardians To Provide Home and Community-based Services to Eligible Members

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Allow Relatives and Legal Guardians To Provide Home and Community-based Services to Eligible Members

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
2018-03-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-28HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2018-03-27SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2018-03-27SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-664), in concurrence.
2018-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-664) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2018-03-27SenateREAD ONCE.
2018-03-27SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2018-03-22HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-22HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-664).
2018-03-22HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-03-22HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-12-22HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2017-12-22HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback