ME LD1708 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Allocations from Maine Turnpike Authority Funds for the Maine Turnpike Authority for the Calendar Year Ending December 31, 2015
Title
An Act To Make Allocations from Maine Turnpike Authority Funds for the Maine Turnpike Authority for the Calendar Year Ending December 31, 2015
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-410). |
2014-03-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-03-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-03-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-410). |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-410) READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-01-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2014-01-09 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Reported by Senator MAZUREK of Knox for the Maine Turnpike Authority pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 23, section 1961, subsection 6. |