ME LD1707 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Transparency on Cable and Internet and Other Communications Services Price Increases
Title
An Act To Increase Transparency on Cable and Internet and Other Communications Services Price Increases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on May 13, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1707&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0560&item=1&snum=130 |