ME LD1704 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Fund the Downeast Correctional Facility
Title
An Act To Fund the Downeast Correctional Facility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #710 (Y: 91 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - House - Recede And Concur RC #539 (Y: 95 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Suspend Rules - RC #509 (Y: 89 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Accept Report RC #513 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #487 (Y: 87 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - Recede And Concur RC #539 (Y: 95 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - Suspend Rules - RC #509 (Y: 89 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Accept Report RC #513 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #487 (Y: 87 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-07-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 710V 91 having voted in the affirmative and 53 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2018-07-09 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 539 (Yeas 95 - Nays 53 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2018-03-27 | House | Subsequently, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-393). |
2018-03-27 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-03-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-22 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-03-22 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-03-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-393) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-393) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator MAKER of Washington The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2018-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-15 | House | Subsequently, FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-15 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-15 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-03-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-06 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-03-06 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 509 (Yeas 89 - Nays 55 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion of Representative TUELL of East Machias to SUSPEND the RULES for the purpose of RECONDISERATION FAILED. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-03-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-20 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-02-20 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) in concurrence |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-02-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 513 Yeas 31 - Nays 3 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-02-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-593). |
2018-02-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-02-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-02-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 487 (Yeas 87 - Nays 59 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2018-02-15 | House | The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-15 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative PERRY of Calais REMOVED. |
2018-02-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-12-22 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-12-22 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017. |