ME LD170 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Pertaining to Transmission Lines Not Needed for Reliability or Local Generation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Pertaining to Transmission Lines Not Needed for Reliability or Local Generation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #613 (Y: 47 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-09HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2022-05-09HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2022-05-09HouseROLL CALL NO. 613V 47 having voted in the affirmative and 73 in the negative, 4 Vacancies with 27 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
2022-05-09HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2022-04-14SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2022-04-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2022-04-13HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2022-04-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-931) in concurrence
2022-04-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-931) READ and ADOPTED
2022-04-12SenateREAD ONCE
2022-04-12SenateOn motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED
2022-04-12SenateTaken from the table by the President
2022-04-11SenateUnfinished Business
2022-04-07SenateUnfinished Business
2022-04-07SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass as Amended,
2022-04-07SenateSenator LAWRENCE of York moved to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass as Amended.
2022-04-07SenateReports READ
2022-04-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2022-04-05HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-931).
2022-04-05HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2022-04-05HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-931) was READ and ADOPTED.
2022-04-05JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2022-04-05HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2022-04-05HouseOn motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2022-04-05HouseReports READ.
2022-03-15JointVoted: Divided Report
2022-03-15JointWork Session Held
2022-03-10JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-07-19HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
2021-06-08JointCarry Over Approved
2021-06-08JointCarry Over Requested
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-25JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-01-21HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-01-21HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on January 21, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback