ME LD17 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Provide Rural Nonmedical Transportation Services to the Elderly and Adults with Disabilities Receiving Home and Community Benefits under the MaineCare Program
Title
Resolve, To Provide Rural Nonmedical Transportation Services to the Elderly and Adults with Disabilities Receiving Home and Community Benefits under the MaineCare Program
Sponsors
Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] |
Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] | Rep. Michele Meyer [D] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Holly Stover [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #140 (Y: 107 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-07 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-148). |
2021-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-148) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 140 (Yeas 107 - Nays 34 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-148) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-148) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-02 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-23 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 11, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |