ME LD17 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-26 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Designating a Portion of Route 1 in Downeast Maine the Hannah and Rebecca Weston Trail
Title
Resolve, Designating a Portion of Route 1 in Downeast Maine the Hannah and Rebecca Weston Trail
Sponsors
Rep. William Tuell [R] | Rep. Robert Alley [D] | Rep. Sheldon Hanington [R] | Rep. Kathy Javner [R] |
Sen. Marianne Moore [R] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] | Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2019-02-21 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-14 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-02-14 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted. |
2019-02-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-01-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence |
2019-01-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-02 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-01-02 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |