ME LD1699 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the Southern Aroostook County Emergency Medical Services Authority
Title
An Act To Establish the Southern Aroostook County Emergency Medical Services Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-269). |
2021-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-269). |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-269) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on May 10, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |