ME LD1696 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Create a Civil Cause of Action for Persons Suffering Damages Arising from the Illegal Sale or Marketing of Firearm-related Products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Create a Civil Cause of Action for Persons Suffering Damages Arising from the Illegal Sale or Marketing of Firearm-related Products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-15 - House - Recede And Concur RC #518 (Y: 71 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Accept Report 'a' Ought To Pass As Amended RC #710 (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - Report "a' Otp-am By Ca "a" RC #506 (Y: 76 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-04-15HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2024-04-15HouseROLL CALL NO. 518 (Yeas 71 - Nays 69 - Absent 10 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
2024-04-15HouseOn motion of Representative POIRIER of Skowhegan, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of REPORT B Ought Not to Pass .
2024-04-12SenateSent down for concurrence
2024-04-12SenateSubsequently The Report B Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2024-04-12SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 710 Yeas 13 - Nays 20 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 FAILED
2024-04-12SenateSenator CARNEY of Cumberland moved to Accept Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-962)
2024-04-12SenateTaken from the table by the President
2024-04-12SenateOn motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF ANY REPORT
2024-04-12SenateReports READ
2024-04-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2024-04-11HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-962).
2024-04-11HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2024-04-11HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-962) was READ and ADOPTED.
2024-04-11HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2024-04-11HouseROLL CALL NO. 506 (Yeas 76 - Nays 72 - Absent 2 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
2024-04-11HouseOn motion of Representative KUHN of Falmouth, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2024-04-11JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP/OTP-AM
2024-04-11HouseReports READ.
2024-01-26JointVoted: Divided Report
2024-01-17JointWork Session Held
2023-07-26HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
2023-07-25JointCarry Over Approved
2023-06-01JointCarry Over Requested
2023-05-30JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2023-04-20SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2023-04-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-04-18HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2023-04-18HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback