ME LD1690 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Modify the Deed for a Parcel of Property in the Town of Carrabassett Valley
Title
Resolve, To Modify the Deed for a Parcel of Property in the Town of Carrabassett Valley
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on May 6, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |