ME LD1688 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Update the Laws Affecting the Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Licensing and Regulatory Services
Title
An Act To Update the Laws Affecting the Department of Health and Human Services, Division of Licensing and Regulatory Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-23 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-744) in concurrence | |
2010-03-23 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-22 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-744) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-22 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-22 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-744) | |
2010-03-22 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-01-07 | (S) On motion by Senator Marrache of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2010-01-06 | (H) Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |