ME LD1684 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Invest in the Health and Wellness of Older Maine Residents by Expanding Coordinated Community Programming

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Invest in the Health and Wellness of Older Maine Residents by Expanding Coordinated Community Programming

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-10HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
2024-05-10SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2024-05-10SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-206) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-757) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2024-05-10SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-757) READ and ADOPTED
2024-05-10SenateUnder suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-206)
2024-05-10SenateOn Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2023-07-26SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
2023-06-06SenateOn motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-06-01HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-01HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-05-30SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2023-05-30SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-206), in concurrence.
2023-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-206) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2023-05-30SenateREAD ONCE.
2023-05-30SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2023-05-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-05-25HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-206).
2023-05-25HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2023-05-25HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2023-05-22JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2023-05-11JointVoted: OTP-AM
2023-05-11JointWork Session Held
2023-04-20SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2023-04-18HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-04-18HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2023-04-18HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback