ME LD1683 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Compensate Certain Department of Corrections Employees and Department of Health and Human Services Employees for Hazardous Work
Title
Resolve, To Compensate Certain Department of Corrections Employees and Department of Health and Human Services Employees for Hazardous Work
Sponsors
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #293 (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-625) in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-625) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-625). |
2021-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-625) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 293 (Yeas 130 - Nays 6 - Absent 15 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-04 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-05-04 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on May 4, 2021. |