ME LD1681 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Correct a Technical Error Pertaining to the Dairy Improvement Fund
Title
An Act To Correct a Technical Error Pertaining to the Dairy Improvement Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-02-27 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-02-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-356). |
2018-02-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-02-22 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-356) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-356) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-02-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |