ME LD1681 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-11 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Appointment Process
Title
An Act To Clarify the Appointment Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - House - Recede And Concur RC #588 (Y: 72 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-04-08 - House - Acc Report 'b' Otp As Amend RC #572 (Y: 78 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - House - Acc Report 'b' Otp As Amend RC #572 (Y: 78 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2016-04-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-11 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-474). |
2016-04-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 588 (Yeas 72 - Nays 74 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-11 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Report C OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-475) Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (S-475) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-08 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-08 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2016-04-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-474). |
2016-04-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-474) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-08 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-04-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 572 (Yeas 78 - Nays 68 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-08 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-475) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (S-475) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Report C Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-475) Report ACCEPTED |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-03-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-29 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-03-29 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |