ME LD1680 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create an Access to Justice Income Tax Credit
Title
An Act To Create an Access to Justice Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Sen. Lisa Keim [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - Enactment RC #499 (Y: 117 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 499 (Yeas 117 - Nays 23 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2018-03-01 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-601), in concurrence. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-601) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-601). |
2018-02-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-02-22 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-12-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2017-12-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 18, 2017. |