ME LD1679 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Expanding Access to Free School Meals
Title
An Act Regarding Expanding Access to Free School Meals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #169 (Y: 117 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #227 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #227 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-623) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-623) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-623) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-623) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-165). |
2021-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 169 (Yeas 117 - Nays 26 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-165) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 227 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on May 4, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |