ME LD1679 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Promote Clean Energy Jobs and To Establish the Maine Climate Council

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Promote Clean Energy Jobs and To Establish the Maine Climate Council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-07 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #209 (Y: 107 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
2019-06-19SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-06-10SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2019-06-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-07HouseROLL CALL NO. 209 (Yeas 107 - Nays 29 - Absent 12 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-07HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-07HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-06-06HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-06HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-221).
2019-06-06HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-06HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-06-06SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-06-06SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-221).
2019-06-06SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-221) READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-06SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-06SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-05-02HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
2019-05-02SenateCommittee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback