ME LD1674 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Access to Medical Care for and Expand the Rights of Adult Clients of State Correctional Facilities
Title
An Act To Improve Access to Medical Care for and Expand the Rights of Adult Clients of State Correctional Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-615). |
2021-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-615) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-05-03 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on May 3, 2021. |