ME LD1671 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a Grant Program To Assist with Dispatch Center Consolidation
Title
An Act To Create a Grant Program To Assist with Dispatch Center Consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #577 (Y: 75 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-06-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2018-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-436) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-801) thereto in concurrence |
2018-06-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-25 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2018-06-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-436) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-801) thereto. |
2018-06-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-06-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-436) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-801) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, House Amendment "A" (H-801) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-436) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-06-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-436) was READ. |
2018-06-25 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-06-25 | House | On further motion of same Representative the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-06-25 | House | On further motion of same Representative the House RECEDED. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby it voted to INSIST. |
2018-06-25 | House | Bill RECALLED From Legislative Files (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1352) |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-04-10 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-10 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-436) |
2018-04-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-09 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2018-04-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 577 (Yeas 75 - Nays 67 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-09 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-436) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-436) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-04-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator WOODSOME of York the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 11, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |