ME LD1670 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Revise the Grandparents Visitation Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Revise the Grandparents Visitation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-02-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-02-27HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-02-22SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2018-02-22SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-597), in concurrence.
2018-02-22SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-597) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2018-02-22SenateREAD ONCE.
2018-02-22SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2018-02-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-02-20HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-597).
2018-02-20HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-02-20HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-12-07HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2017-12-07HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on December 5, 2017.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback