ME LD1669 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Help Ensure That Direct Initiatives of Legislation Are Compatible with the Constitution of Maine and Statutory Law
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Help Ensure That Direct Initiatives of Legislation Are Compatible with the Constitution of Maine and Statutory Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Ontp RC #316 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - Acc Report 'a' Ontp RC #276 (Y: 85 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - Acc Report 'a' Ontp RC #276 (Y: 85 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 316 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock Report A Ought Not to Pass ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 276 (Yeas 85 - Nays 61 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, REPORT A Ought Not to Pass was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-02 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |