ME LD1668 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Change Certain Gender-specific Terminology in the Laws Regarding Municipalities and Counties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Change Certain Gender-specific Terminology in the Laws Regarding Municipalities and Counties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - Acc Min Ought To Pass Rep RC #498 (Y: 81 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2018-03-22SenateOn motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Majority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-03-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-20HouseThe House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED.
2018-03-15SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-03-15SenateSubsequently On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-03-15SenateTaken from the table by the President
2018-03-06SenateUnfinished Business
2018-03-06SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-03-06SenateSenator DAVIS of Piscataquis moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-03-06SenateReports READ
2018-03-01HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-01HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2018-03-01HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2018-03-01HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2018-03-01HouseROLL CALL NO. 498 (Yeas 81 - Nays 62 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
2018-03-01HouseOn motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Minority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-03-01HouseReports READ.
2017-12-06HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2017-12-06HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on December 4, 2017.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback