ME LD1665 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Improve Breast Health Care by Providing Coverage for Genetic Counseling and Testing
Title
An Act to Improve Breast Health Care by Providing Coverage for Genetic Counseling and Testing
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Rotundo [D] | Rep. Margaret Craven [D] | Sen. Henry Ingwersen [D] | Rep. Holly Stover [D] |
Rep. Bruce White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-15 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1665&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0670&item=1&snum=131 |