ME LD1661 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create the Drug Donation and Redispensing Program
Title
An Act To Create the Drug Donation and Redispensing Program
Sponsors
Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Rep. Michele Meyer [D] | Sen. Marianne Moore [R] |
Rep. Beth O'Connor [R] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] | Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-227). |
2019-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-227). |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-227) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |